MI HB5267 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-7)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 465'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-7)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 465'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
School aid; membership; special pupil membership count for qualifying dropout recovery program; provide for, and adjust certain other membership calculations and fund sources. Amends secs. 6, 11, 25, 26b & 201 of 1979 PA 94 (MCL 388.1606 et seq.) & adds secs. 23a & 25d. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0969'12
Title
School aid; membership; special pupil membership count for qualifying dropout recovery program; provide for, and adjust certain other membership calculations and fund sources. Amends secs. 6, 11, 25, 26b & 201 of 1979 PA 94 (MCL 388.1606 et seq.) & adds secs. 23a & 25d. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0969'12
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-13 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 832 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 917 (Y: 11 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-09-27 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Education (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-07 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 378 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Education (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 917 (Y: 11 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-09-27 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Education (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-07 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 378 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Education (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 465'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/27/2012 @ 3:30 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/22/2012 @ 11:30 Am 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-27 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/20/2012 @ 2:52 Pm |
2012-12-13 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-13 | House | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2012-12-13 | House | Roll Call # 832 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2012-12-13 | House | Senate Substitute S-5 Concurred In |
2012-12-12 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2012-12-12 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-5 With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment |
2012-12-12 | Senate | Title Amended |
2012-12-12 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 917 Yeas 11 Nays 26 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2012-12-12 | Senate | Amendment(s) Defeated |
2012-12-12 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-12-12 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2012-12-12 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-5 As Amended |
2012-12-12 | Senate | Substitute S-5 As Amended Concurred In |
2012-12-12 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-5 And Amendment(s) |
2012-09-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2 |
2012-09-27 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-09-27 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2012-09-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Education |
2012-09-13 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Education |
2012-06-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2012-06-07 | House | Title Amended |
2012-06-07 | House | Transmitted |
2012-06-07 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 378 Yeas 108 Nays 0 |
2012-06-07 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-06-06 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-06-06 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2012-06-06 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-05-23 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-05-23 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2012-02-15 | House | Recommendation Concurred In |
2012-02-15 | House | Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Education |
2012-01-25 | House | Printed Bill Filed 01/25/2012 |
2012-01-24 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2012-01-24 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-01-24 | House | Introduced By Representative Bob Genetski |
Same As/Similar To
SB0969 (Same As) 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0516'12 With Immediate Effect