MI HB5261 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-16 - Assigned Pa 248'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-16 - Assigned Pa 248'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Sales tax; exemptions; sale of vehicles to certain family members; exempt. Amends 1937 PA 94 (MCL 205.91 - 205.111) by adding sec. 4bb.
Title
Sales tax; exemptions; sale of vehicles to certain family members; exempt. Amends 1937 PA 94 (MCL 205.91 - 205.111) by adding sec. 4bb.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-12 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 440 (Y: 109 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 440 (Y: 109 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 444 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 223 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 440 (Y: 109 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 444 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 223 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-16 | House | Assigned Pa 248'14 With Immediate Effect |
2014-07-16 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 6/27/2014 @ 2:23 Pm |
2014-07-16 | House | Approved By The Governor 6/21/2014 @ 6:02 Pm |
2014-07-16 | House | Presented To The Governor 6/19/2014 @ 12:04 Pm |
2014-06-12 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2014-06-12 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2014-06-12 | House | Roll Call # 440 Yeas 109 Nays 1 |
2014-06-12 | House | Senate Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2014-06-12 | House | Rule Suspended |
2014-06-12 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2014-06-12 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-2 With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 444 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance |
2014-05-13 | House | Transmitted |
2014-05-13 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 223 Yeas 110 Nays 0 |
2014-05-13 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-05-08 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-05-08 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-04-30 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-04-30 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2014-01-30 | House | Printed Bill Filed 01/29/2014 |
2014-01-29 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2014-01-29 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-01-29 | House | Introduced By Representative Kevin Cotter |