MI HB5259 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-01 - Re-referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-01 - Re-referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Courts: judges; number of judges in Ottawa County; modify. Amends sec. 521 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.521).
Title
Courts: judges; number of judges in Ottawa County; modify. Amends sec. 521 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.521).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-11-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 443 (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-11-03 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 475 (Y: 67 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-03 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 475 (Y: 67 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-01 | House | Re-referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2021-11-30 | House | Vetoed By The Governor 11/30/2021 |
2021-11-30 | House | Presented To The Governor 11/17/2021 02:57 Pm |
2021-11-10 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2021-11-10 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2021-11-10 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2021-11-10 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2021-11-10 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 443 Yeas 34 Nays 1 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2021-11-09 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2021-11-09 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety |
2021-10-14 | House | Transmitted |
2021-10-14 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 475 Yeas 67 Nays 40 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2021-10-14 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-10-13 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-10-13 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-10-05 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-10-05 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-08-18 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 08/17/2021 |
2021-08-17 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2021-08-17 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-08-17 | House | Introduced By Representative Luke Meerman |