MI HB5259 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Assigned Pa 150'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Assigned Pa 150'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Transportation; other; taxi service, limousine, and transportation network company vehicle signage regulations; revise. Amends sec. 11 of 2016 PA 345 (MCL 257.2111).
Title
Transportation; other; taxi service, limousine, and transportation network company vehicle signage regulations; revise. Amends sec. 11 of 2016 PA 345 (MCL 257.2111).
Sponsors
Rep. Brandt Iden [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 246 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 131 (Y: 105 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 131 (Y: 105 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-16 | House | Assigned Pa 150'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-05-16 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 5/16/2018 @ 10:12 Am |
2018-05-16 | House | Approved By The Governor 5/15/2018 @ 2:02 Pm |
2018-05-10 | House | Presented To The Governor 5/10/2018 @ 12:20 Pm |
2018-05-08 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-05-08 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-05-08 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 246 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2018-03-06 | House | Transmitted |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 131 Yeas 105 Nays 3 |
2018-03-06 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-03-01 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-03-01 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2018-03-01 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-02-21 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-02-21 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2017-11-29 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 11/28/2017 |
2017-11-28 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2017-11-28 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-11-28 | House | Introduced By Representative Brandt Iden |
Subjects
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs
Transportation: limousines
Transportation: other
Transportation: limousines
Transportation: other