MI HB5231 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - Vetoed By The Governor 12/27/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - Vetoed By The Governor 12/27/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Retirement; state employees; annuity option; provide for. Amends sec. 58 of 1943 PA 240 (MCL 38.58).
Title
Retirement; state employees; annuity option; provide for. Amends sec. 58 of 1943 PA 240 (MCL 38.58).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-21 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 1014 (Y: 72 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 969 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 179 (Y: 71 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 969 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 179 (Y: 71 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-28 | House | Vetoed By The Governor 12/27/2018 |
2018-12-28 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/27/2018 @ 3:12 Pm |
2018-12-21 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-21 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-12-21 | House | Roll Call # 1014 Yeas 72 Nays 35 |
2018-12-21 | House | Senate Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2018-12-21 | House | Rule Suspended |
2018-12-21 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2018-12-21 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-2 With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 969 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance |
2018-03-21 | House | Transmitted |
2018-03-21 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 179 Yeas 71 Nays 37 |
2018-03-21 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-03-15 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-03-15 | House | Substitute H-6 Adopted |
2018-03-15 | House | Substitute H-3 Not Adopted |
2018-03-15 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-01-24 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-01-24 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 |
2017-11-09 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 11/08/2017 |
2017-11-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Financial Liability Reform |
2017-11-08 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-11-08 | House | Introduced By Representative Thomas Albert |