MI HB5230 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-31 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-31 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Torts; liability; indemnity agreement in snowplow and deicing services contracts; prohibit. Creates new act.
Title
Torts; liability; indemnity agreement in snowplow and deicing services contracts; prohibit. Creates new act.
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Yonker [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-25 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 319 (Y: 101 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-31 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2016-05-25 | House | Transmitted |
2016-05-25 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 319 Yeas 101 Nays 8 |
2016-05-25 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-05-24 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-05-24 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted And Amended |
2016-05-24 | House | Read A Second Time |
2016-04-19 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-04-19 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2016-01-26 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 01/21/2016 |
2016-01-21 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2016-01-21 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-01-21 | House | Introduced By Representative Ken Yonker |