MI HB5175 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 14 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-09 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 14 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-09 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Juveniles; criminal procedure; juvenile competency and culpability; clarify. Amends 1974 PA 258 (MCL 330.1001 - 330.2106) by adding secs. 1060, 1060a, 1060b, 1062, 1064, 1066, 1068 & 1070.
Title
Juveniles; criminal procedure; juvenile competency and culpability; clarify. Amends 1974 PA 258 (MCL 330.1001 - 330.2106) by adding secs. 1060, 1060a, 1060b, 1062, 1064, 1066, 1068 & 1070.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-09 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2010-06-09 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4 | |
2009-07-15 | Printed Bill Filed 07/15/2009 | |
2009-07-14 | Referred To Committee On Judiciary | |
2009-07-14 | Read A First Time | |
2009-07-14 | Introduced By Representative Tonya Schuitmaker |
Subjects
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2009-HB-5175 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2009-2010/billintroduced/House/htm/2009-HIB-5175.htm |