MI HB5169 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy
Pending: Senate Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Health: screening; mental health screenings and resources for mothers; provide for during certain time periods. Amends 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.1101 - 333.25211) by adding sec. 9137.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health: screening; mental health screenings and resources for mothers; provide for during certain time periods. Amends 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.1101 - 333.25211) by adding sec. 9137.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-06-26 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 233 (Y: 102 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-26SenateReferred To Committee On Health Policy
2024-06-26HouseTransmitted
2024-06-26HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 233 Yeas 102 Nays 7 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
2024-06-26HouseRead A Third Time
2024-06-26HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2024-06-26HousePlaced On Third Reading
2024-06-26HouseSubstitute (h-1) Adopted
2024-06-26HouseRead A Second Time
2023-11-02HouseReferred To Second Reading
2023-11-02HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
2023-10-18HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 10/17/2023
2023-10-17HouseReferred To Committee On Health Policy
2023-10-17HouseRead A First Time
2023-10-17HouseIntroduced By Representative Rachel Hood

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback