MI HB5158 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-22 - Assigned Pa 325'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-22 - Assigned Pa 325'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Law enforcement; other; human trafficking commission act; enact. Creates new act. TIE BAR WITH: HB 5234'14, SB 0596'13
Title
Law enforcement; other; human trafficking commission act; enact. Creates new act. TIE BAR WITH: HB 5234'14, SB 0596'13
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-10-02 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 557 (Y: 106 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-02 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 557 (Y: 106 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 633 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 5 (Y: 109 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-02 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 557 (Y: 106 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 633 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 5 (Y: 109 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-22 | House | Assigned Pa 325'14 With Immediate Effect |
2014-10-22 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/16/2014 @ 3:27 Pm |
2014-10-22 | House | Approved By The Governor 10/16/2014 @ 10:49 Am |
2014-10-22 | House | Presented To The Governor 10/7/2014 @ 4:02 Pm |
2014-10-02 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2014-10-02 | House | Roll Call # 557 Yeas 106 Nays 1 |
2014-10-02 | House | Senate Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2014-10-02 | House | Rule Suspended |
2014-10-02 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2014-10-02 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-2 With Immediate Effect |
2014-10-02 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 633 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2014-10-02 | Senate | Amendment(s) Adopted |
2014-10-01 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 As Amended |
2014-10-01 | Senate | Substitute S-2 As Amended Concurred In |
2014-10-01 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 And Amendment(s) |
2014-10-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2 |
2014-10-01 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-10-01 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Human Services |
2014-01-22 | House | Transmitted |
2014-01-22 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 5 Yeas 109 Nays 1 |
2014-01-22 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-01-15 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-01-15 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2014-01-15 | House | Read A Second Time |
2013-12-04 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2013-12-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2013-12-03 | House | Printed Bill Filed 11/15/2013 |
2013-11-14 | House | Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice |
2013-11-14 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-11-14 | House | Introduced By Representative Kurt Heise |