MI HB5158 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Introduced on June 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-13 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy
Pending: Senate Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-13 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy
Pending: Senate Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Health; other; crisis pregnancy organizations; informed consent by pregnant women; require organizations to obtain before providing services. Creates new act.
Title
Health; other; crisis pregnancy organizations; informed consent by pregnant women; require organizations to obtain before providing services. Creates new act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Referred To Committee On Health Policy | |
2010-03-24 | Transmitted | |
2010-03-24 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 104 Yeas 66 Nays 42 | |
2010-03-24 | Read A Third Time | |
2010-03-24 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2010-03-24 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2010-03-24 | Substitute H-2 Adopted | |
2010-03-24 | Read A Second Time | |
2009-09-09 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2009-09-09 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 | |
2009-07-14 | Printed Bill Filed 06/26/2009 | |
2009-06-25 | Referred To Committee On Judiciary | |
2009-06-25 | Read A First Time | |
2009-06-25 | Introduced By Representative Mark Meadows |