MI HB5153 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 555'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 555'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Probate; guardians and conservators; nonopioid directive form; allow a guardian to execute. Amends secs. 1106 & 5314 of 1998 PA 386 (MCL 700.1106 & 700.5314).
Title
Probate; guardians and conservators; nonopioid directive form; allow a guardian to execute. Amends secs. 1106 & 5314 of 1998 PA 386 (MCL 700.1106 & 700.5314).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-21 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 1035 (Y: 104 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 1032 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 195 (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 1032 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 195 (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 555'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/28/2018 @ 3:00 Pm |
2018-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/27/2018 @ 4:35 Pm 12/31/18 Addenda |
2018-12-28 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/26/2018 @ 6:34 Pm |
2018-12-21 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-21 | House | Roll Call # 1035 Yeas 104 Nays 1 |
2018-12-21 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-12-21 | House | Rule Suspended |
2018-12-21 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2018-12-21 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 1032 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2018-03-22 | House | Transmitted |
2018-03-22 | House | Title Amended |
2018-03-22 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 195 Yeas 108 Nays 1 |
2018-03-22 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-03-21 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2018-03-21 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-02-28 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-02-28 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2017-10-24 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/19/2017 |
2017-10-19 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2017-10-19 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-10-19 | House | Introduced By Representative Edward Canfield |
Subjects
Controlled substances: other
Health facilities: patient directives
Health occupations: emergency medical services personnel
Health occupations: health professionals
Health: patient choice
Health: patient directives
Probate: guardians and conservators
Health facilities: patient directives
Health occupations: emergency medical services personnel
Health occupations: health professionals
Health: patient choice
Health: patient directives
Probate: guardians and conservators