MI HB5152 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 554'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 554'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Health; patient directives; nonopioid directive form; create. Amends 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.1101 - 333.25211) by adding sec. 9145.
Title
Health; patient directives; nonopioid directive form; create. Amends 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.1101 - 333.25211) by adding sec. 9145.
Sponsors
Sen. Samir Singh [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 1031 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-12-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 194 (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 194 (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 554'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/28/2018 @ 2:58 Pm |
2018-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/27/2018 @ 4:33 Pm 12/31/18 Addenda |
2018-12-28 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/26/2018 @ 6:32 Pm |
2018-12-21 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-21 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-12-21 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 1031 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2018-03-22 | House | Transmitted |
2018-03-22 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 194 Yeas 108 Nays 1 |
2018-03-22 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-03-21 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2018-03-21 | House | Substitute H-1 Not Adopted |
2018-03-21 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-02-28 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-02-28 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2017-10-24 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/19/2017 |
2017-10-19 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2017-10-19 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-10-19 | House | Introduced By Representative Sam Singh |
Subjects
Controlled substances: other
Health facilities: patient directives
Health occupations: emergency medical services personnel
Health occupations: health professionals
Health: patient choice
Health: patient directives
State agencies (existing): health and human services
Health facilities: patient directives
Health occupations: emergency medical services personnel
Health occupations: health professionals
Health: patient choice
Health: patient directives
State agencies (existing): health and human services