MI HB5139 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-15 - Assigned Pa 229'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-15 - Assigned Pa 229'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Education; curriculum; instruction on a career exploration and job readiness; require. Amends 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1 - 380.1852) by adding sec. 1166a.
Title
Education; curriculum; instruction on a career exploration and job readiness; require. Amends 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1 - 380.1852) by adding sec. 1166a.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-12 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 517 (Y: 98 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 446 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 503 (Y: 97 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 446 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 503 (Y: 97 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-15 | House | Assigned Pa 229'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-08-15 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 6/27/2018 @ 9:14 Am |
2018-08-15 | House | Approved By The Governor 6/26/2018 @ 2:42 Pm |
2018-08-15 | House | Presented To The Governor 6/25/2018 @ 1:46 Pm |
2018-06-12 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-06-12 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-06-12 | House | Roll Call # 517 Yeas 98 Nays 11 |
2018-06-12 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-06-12 | House | Rule Suspended |
2018-06-12 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2018-06-12 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 446 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 As Amended |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Substitute S-1 As Amended Concurred In |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 And Amendment(s) |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Economic Development And International Investment |
2017-12-13 | House | Transmitted |
2017-12-13 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 503 Yeas 97 Nays 13 |
2017-12-13 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-12-13 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2017-12-13 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-12-13 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2017-12-13 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-12-12 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-12-12 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2017-10-24 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/19/2017 |
2017-10-19 | House | Referred To Committee On Workforce And Talent Development |
2017-10-19 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-10-19 | House | Introduced By Representative Daire Rendon |