MI HB5127 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-3)
Status: Introduced on October 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Placed On Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Placed On Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Vehicles: registration plates; eligibility for disabled veteran registration plate; extend to partially disabled veterans. Amends sec. 803f of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.803f).
Title
Vehicles: registration plates; eligibility for disabled veteran registration plate; extend to partially disabled veterans. Amends sec. 803f of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.803f).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2024-03-13 | House | Read A Second Time |
2024-03-05 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2024-03-05 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2023-10-12 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/11/2023 |
2023-10-11 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation, Mobility And Infrastructure |
2023-10-11 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-10-11 | House | Introduced By Representative Mike Mcfall |