MI HB5113 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on October 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-18 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-18 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Highways; memorial; portion of US-131; designate as the "Park Ranger Kristopher William Eggle Memorial Highway". Amends 2001 PA 142 (MCL 250.1001 - 250.2084) by adding sec. 55a.
Title
Highways; memorial; portion of US-131; designate as the "Park Ranger Kristopher William Eggle Memorial Highway". Amends 2001 PA 142 (MCL 250.1001 - 250.2084) by adding sec. 55a.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2019-10-17 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/17/2019 |
2019-10-16 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2019-10-16 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-10-16 | House | Introduced By Representative Michele Hoitenga |
Subjects
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2019-HB-5113 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/House/htm/2019-HIB-5113.htm |