MI HB5097 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-28 - Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
Pending: Senate Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Financial institutions; small loan companies; licensed providers of deferred presentment service transactions to make certain small loans; allow. Amends title & secs. 2, 11, 13, 15, 17, 22, 31, 32, 33, 34, 35, 36, 45 & 53 of 2005 PA 244 (MCL 487.2122 et seq.) & adds secs. 31a & 32a.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Financial institutions; small loan companies; licensed providers of deferred presentment service transactions to make certain small loans; allow. Amends title & secs. 2, 11, 13, 15, 17, 22, 31, 32, 33, 34, 35, 36, 45 & 53 of 2005 PA 244 (MCL 487.2122 et seq.) & adds secs. 31a & 32a.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-5 (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-28SenateReferred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
2020-05-27HouseTransmitted
2020-05-27HouseTitle Amended
2020-05-27HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 216 Yeas 58 Nays 49 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
2020-05-27HouseRead A Third Time
2020-05-27HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2020-05-27HousePlaced On Third Reading
2020-05-27HouseSubstitute (h-5) Adopted
2020-05-27HouseRead A Second Time
2020-05-27HouseReferred To Second Reading
2020-05-27HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-5)
2019-12-10HouseReferred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-3)
2019-10-15HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 10/15/2019
2019-10-10HouseReferred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
2019-10-10HouseRead A First Time
2019-10-10HouseIntroduced By Representative Brandt Iden

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback