MI HB5095 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-22 - Assigned Pa 21'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-22 - Assigned Pa 21'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Courts; judges; certain district court judgeship; reduce in number. Amends sec. 8160 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.8160).
Title
Courts; judges; certain district court judgeship; reduce in number. Amends sec. 8160 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.8160).
Sponsors
Rep. Roy Schmidt [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 49 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 600 (Y: 100 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 600 (Y: 100 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-22 | House | Assigned Pa 21'12 With Immediate Effect |
2012-02-22 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 2/22/2012 @ 1:13 Pm |
2012-02-22 | House | Approved By The Governor 2/21/2012 @ 8:43 Am |
2012-02-14 | House | Presented To The Governor 2/9/2012 @ 2:34 Pm |
2012-02-07 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2012-02-07 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-02-07 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 49 Yeas 37 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2011-12-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2011-12-14 | House | Transmitted |
2011-12-14 | House | Title Amended |
2011-12-14 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 600 Yeas 100 Nays 7 |
2011-12-14 | House | Read A Third Time |
2011-12-14 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2011-12-14 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2011-12-14 | House | Amended |
2011-12-14 | House | Read A Second Time |
2011-12-07 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2011-12-07 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2011-10-19 | House | Printed Bill Filed 10/19/2011 |
2011-10-18 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2011-10-18 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-10-18 | House | Introduced By Representative Roy Schmidt |