MI HB5055 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-4)
Status: Passed on December 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-31 - Assigned Pa 275'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-4)
Status: Passed on December 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-31 - Assigned Pa 275'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Crime victims: rights; victim of domestic violence incident notice of rights; require information on address confidentiality program. Amends sec. 15c, ch. IV of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 764.15c). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0070'19
Title
Crime victims: rights; victim of domestic violence incident notice of rights; require information on address confidentiality program. Amends sec. 15c, ch. IV of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 764.15c). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0070'19
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 478 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 118 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 118 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 275'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/29/2020 01:22 Pm |
2020-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/29/2020 09:32 Am |
2020-12-16 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/16/2020 08:56 Am |
2020-12-10 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2020-12-10 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-12-10 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 478 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety |
2020-02-25 | House | Transmitted |
2020-02-25 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 118 Yeas 107 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2020-02-25 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-02-25 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-02-25 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-02-25 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2020-02-25 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-02-11 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2019-10-10 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/10/2019 |
2019-10-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2019-10-08 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-10-08 | House | Introduced By Representative Julie Calley |