MI HB5055 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-13 - Assigned Pa 255'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-13 - Assigned Pa 255'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Agriculture; other; provision related to silos treated with polychlorinated biphenyls; repeal. Repeals 1983 PA 220 (MCL 288.451 - 288.454).
Title
Agriculture; other; provision related to silos treated with polychlorinated biphenyls; repeal. Repeals 1983 PA 220 (MCL 288.451 - 288.454).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 378 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-25 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 67 (Y: 96 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-25 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 67 (Y: 96 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-13 | House | Assigned Pa 255'16 With Immediate Effect |
2016-07-13 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 6/28/2016 @ 11:20 Am |
2016-07-13 | House | Approved By The Governor 6/27/2016 @ 1:03 Pm |
2016-07-13 | House | Presented To The Governor 6/21/2016 @ 10:46 Am |
2016-06-08 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2016-06-08 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 378 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Agriculture |
2016-02-24 | House | Transmitted |
2016-02-24 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 67 Yeas 96 Nays 7 |
2016-02-24 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-02-23 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-02-23 | House | Read A Second Time |
2016-02-03 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-02-03 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2015-11-05 | House | Printed Bill Filed 11/05/2015 |
2015-11-04 | House | Referred To Committee On Agriculture |
2015-11-04 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-11-04 | House | Introduced By Representative John Bizon |