MI HB5048 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Introduced on October 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-10-11 - Printed Bill Filed 10/06/2011
Pending: House Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-10-11 - Printed Bill Filed 10/06/2011
Pending: House Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Human services; medical services; office of medicaid inspector general; create. Amends 1939 PA 280 (MCL 400.1 - 400.119b) by adding secs. 104, 104a, 104b, 104c & 104d.
Title
Human services; medical services; office of medicaid inspector general; create. Amends 1939 PA 280 (MCL 400.1 - 400.119b) by adding secs. 104, 104a, 104b, 104c & 104d.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-11 | House | Printed Bill Filed 10/06/2011 |
2011-10-06 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2011-10-06 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-10-06 | House | Introduced By Representative Bob Genetski |
Same As/Similar To
SB0599 (Same As) 2011-09-07 - Referred To Committee On Appropriations
Subjects
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2011-HB-5048 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billintroduced/House/htm/2011-HIB-5048.htm |