MI HB4993 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-07-15 - Referred To Committee On Campaign And Election Oversight
Pending: Senate Campaign & Election Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-07-15 - Referred To Committee On Campaign And Election Oversight
Pending: Senate Campaign & Election Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; registration; elector registering to vote in person; expand to include at any county, city, or township clerk's office in this state. Amends secs. 509v & 509w of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.509v & 168.509w).
Title
Elections; registration; elector registering to vote in person; expand to include at any county, city, or township clerk's office in this state. Amends secs. 509v & 509w of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.509v & 168.509w).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-15 | Referred To Committee On Campaign And Election Oversight | |
2009-06-25 | Transmitted | |
2009-06-25 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 339 Yeas 80 Nays 28 | |
2009-06-25 | Read A Third Time | |
2009-06-25 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2009-06-25 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2009-06-25 | Substitute H-5 Adopted | |
2009-06-25 | Read A Second Time | |
2009-06-24 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2009-06-24 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment(s) | |
2009-05-27 | Printed Bill Filed 05/27/2009 | |
2009-05-26 | Referred To Committee On Ethics And Elections | |
2009-05-26 | Read A First Time | |
2009-05-26 | Introduced By Representative Tim Melton |
Subjects
Elections, election officials
Elections, registration
Elections, voters
State agencies (existing), state
Elections, registration
Elections, voters
State agencies (existing), state