MI HB4979 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on October 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-14 - Printed Bill Filed 10/14/2015
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-14 - Printed Bill Filed 10/14/2015
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Occupations; vehicles, dealers and repair facilities; breath alcohol ignition interlock mechanics and servicers; include in motor vehicle service and repair act. Amends secs. 2 & 10 of 1974 PA 300 (MCL 257.1302 & 257.1310) & adds secs. 6a & 10a. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0176'15
Title
Occupations; vehicles, dealers and repair facilities; breath alcohol ignition interlock mechanics and servicers; include in motor vehicle service and repair act. Amends secs. 2 & 10 of 1974 PA 300 (MCL 257.1302 & 257.1310) & adds secs. 6a & 10a. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0176'15
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-14 | House | Printed Bill Filed 10/14/2015 |
2015-10-13 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2015-10-13 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-10-13 | House | Introduced By Representative Klint Kesto |
Same As/Similar To
SB0357 (Same As) 2016-03-09 - Assigned Pa 0033'16 With Immediate Effect
Subjects
Crimes: intoxication or impairment
Occupations: vehicles, dealers and repair facilities
State agencies (existing): state
Vehicles: other
Occupations: vehicles, dealers and repair facilities
State agencies (existing): state
Vehicles: other
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2015-HB-4979 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2015-2016/billintroduced/House/htm/2015-HIB-4979.htm |