MI HB4953 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Assigned Pa 88'22
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Assigned Pa 88'22
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Education: other; informational packet including certain information regarding postsecondary education; require the department of education to develop and update and provide to school districts, intermediate school districts, public school academies, and nonpublic schools. Amends 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1 - 380.1852) by adding sec. 1293.
Title
Education: other; informational packet including certain information regarding postsecondary education; require the department of education to develop and update and provide to school districts, intermediate school districts, public school academies, and nonpublic schools. Amends 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1 - 380.1852) by adding sec. 1293.
Sponsors
Rep. David Martin [R] | Rep. Brad Paquette [R] | Rep. Elizabeth Griffin [R] | Rep. Phil Green [R] |
Rep. Andrew Fink [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-18 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 214 (Y: 98 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 213 (Y: 97 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 231 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 27 (Y: 94 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 213 (Y: 97 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 231 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 27 (Y: 94 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | House | Assigned Pa 88'22 |
2022-06-01 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 05/26/2022 01:42 Pm |
2022-06-01 | House | Approved By The Governor 05/26/2022 10:56 Am |
2022-05-19 | House | Presented To The Governor 05/19/2022 04:53 Pm |
2022-05-18 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2022-05-18 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2022-05-18 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 214 Yeas 98 Nays 8 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 |
2022-05-18 | House | Senate Substitute (s-3) Concurred In |
2022-05-18 | House | Vote On Concurring Reconsidered |
2022-05-18 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 213 Yeas 97 Nays 8 Excused 0 Not Voting 5 |
2022-05-18 | House | Senate Substitute (s-3) Concurred In |
2022-05-17 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2022-05-17 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-3) With Full Title |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 231 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Substitute (s-3) Adopted |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-2) |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Substitute (s-2) Concurred In |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-2) |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-2) |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-2) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Education And Career Readiness |
2022-02-01 | House | Transmitted |
2022-02-01 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 27 Yeas 94 Nays 11 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2022-02-01 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-01-27 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-01-27 | House | Substitute (h-2) Adopted |
2022-01-27 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-10-19 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-10-19 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2) |
2021-06-02 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/01/2021 |
2021-06-01 | House | Referred To Committee On Education |
2021-06-01 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-06-01 | House | Introduced By Representative David Martin |
Subjects
Education: career and technical
Education: dual enrollment
Education: other
Education: students
State agencies (existing): education
Education: dual enrollment
Education: other
Education: students
State agencies (existing): education