MI HB4944 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Engrossed on December 3 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-12-05 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy
Pending: Senate Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Insurance: health benefits; hearing aids for children; require coverage for. Amends 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.100 - 500.8302) by adding sec. 3406z. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4963'23

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance: health benefits; hearing aids for children; require coverage for. Amends 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.100 - 500.8302) by adding sec. 3406z. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4963'23

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-12-03 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 368 (Y: 76 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-12-05SenateReferred To Committee On Health Policy
2024-12-03HouseTransmitted
2024-12-03HouseTitle Amended
2024-12-03HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 368 Yeas 76 Nays 29 Excused 0 Not Voting 5
2024-12-03HouseRead A Third Time
2024-12-03HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2024-12-03HousePlaced On Third Reading
2024-12-03HouseSubstitute (h-3) Adopted
2024-12-03HouseSubstitute (h-2) Adopted
2024-12-03HouseRead A Second Time
2024-02-13HouseReferred To Second Reading
2024-02-13HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2)
2023-09-12HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 09/07/2023
2023-09-07HouseReferred To Committee On Insurance And Financial Services
2023-09-07HouseRead A First Time
2023-09-07HouseIntroduced By Representative Dale Zorn

Same As/Similar To

HB4963 (Same As) 2024-12-05 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback