MI HB4933 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Introduced on May 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-21 - Notice Given To Discharge Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-21 - Notice Given To Discharge Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Individual income tax: credit; earned income tax credit; restore. Amends sec. 272 of 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.272).
Title
Individual income tax: credit; earned income tax credit; restore. Amends sec. 272 of 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.272).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-21 | House | Notice Given To Discharge Committee |
2022-09-21 | House | Motion To Discharge Committee Postponed For Day |
2021-06-01 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/27/2021 |
2021-05-27 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2021-05-27 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-05-27 | House | Introduced By Representative Angela Witwer |
Subjects
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2021-HB-4933 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billintroduced/House/htm/2021-HIB-4933.htm |