MI HB4928 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 12 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-09-05 - Referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Criminal procedure; sentencing guidelines; guidelines for violation of the lawful internet gaming act; enact. Amends sec. 14d, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.14d). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4926'17

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal procedure; sentencing guidelines; guidelines for violation of the lawful internet gaming act; enact. Amends sec. 14d, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.14d). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4926'17

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 553 (Y: 73 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-05SenateReferred To Committee On Government Operations
2018-06-12HouseTransmitted
2018-06-12HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 553 Yeas 73 Nays 36
2018-06-12HouseRead A Third Time
2018-06-12HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2018-06-12HousePlaced On Third Reading
2018-06-12HouseRead A Second Time
2017-12-13HouseReferred To Second Reading
2017-12-13HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2017-09-13HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 09/12/2017
2017-09-12HouseReferred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
2017-09-12HouseRead A First Time
2017-09-12HouseIntroduced By Representative Klint Kesto

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback