MI HB4929 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 9 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 9 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Traffic control: civil infraction procedures; revised judicature act; revise to reflect distribution of certain fines to school districts. Amends secs. 8379 & 8396 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.8379 & 600.8396). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4928'23, HB 4930'23
Title
Traffic control: civil infraction procedures; revised judicature act; revise to reflect distribution of certain fines to school districts. Amends secs. 8379 & 8396 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.8379 & 600.8396). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4928'23, HB 4930'23
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-09 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 574 (Y: 79 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-09 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 574 (Y: 79 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2024-06-06 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2023-11-14 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2023-11-09 | House | Transmitted |
2023-11-09 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 574 Yeas 79 Nays 28 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 |
2023-11-09 | House | Read A Third Time |
2023-11-09 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2023-11-09 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2023-11-09 | House | Read A Second Time |
2023-11-08 | House | Placed On Second Reading |
2023-11-08 | House | Motion To Discharge Committee Approved |
2023-11-07 | House | Notice Given To Discharge Committee |
2023-08-24 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 08/23/2023 |
2023-08-23 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2023-08-23 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-08-23 | House | Introduced By Representative Tyrone Carter |
Same As/Similar To
HB4928 (Same As) 2024-06-06 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-3)
HB4930 (Same As) 2024-06-06 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
HB4930 (Same As) 2024-06-06 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)