MI HB4921 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-27 - Transmitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Traffic control: speed restrictions; speed limit enforcement mechanisms in school zones: provide for. Amends sec. 907 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.907) & adds secs. 79g & 627c. TIE BAR WITH: HB 5726'24

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Traffic control: speed restrictions; speed limit enforcement mechanisms in school zones: provide for. Amends sec. 907 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.907) & adds secs. 79g & 627c. TIE BAR WITH: HB 5726'24

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-05-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-27HouseTransmitted
2024-06-27HouseTitle Amended
2024-06-27HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 286 Yeas 60 Nays 50 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2024-06-27HouseRead A Third Time
2024-06-26HousePlaced On Third Reading
2024-06-26HouseSubstitute (h-2) Adopted
2024-06-26HouseRead A Second Time
2024-05-22HouseReferred To Second Reading
2024-05-22HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2)
2023-07-19HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 07/18/2023
2023-07-18HouseReferred To Committee On Local Government And Municipal Finance
2023-07-18HouseRead A First Time
2023-07-18HouseIntroduced By Representative John Fitzgerald

Same As/Similar To

HB5726 (Same As) 2024-06-27 - Transmitted

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://legislature.mi.gov/Bills/Bill?ObjectName=2023-HB-4921
Texthttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billintroduced/House/htm/2023-HIB-4921.htm
Texthttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billengrossed/House/htm/2023-HEBH-4921.htm
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/House/pdf/2023-HLA-4921-0F12E975.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/House/pdf/2023-HLA-4921-B6F2BD31.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/House/pdf/2023-HLA-4921-1E5E5A83.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/House/pdf/2023-HLA-4921-3BFDDED4.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/House/pdf/2023-HLA-4921-9BB44726.pdf
Roll Callhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/Journal/House/htm/2024-HJ-05-22-046.htm

Bill Comments

feedback