MI HB4921 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-07 - Assigned Pa 119'21 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-07 - Assigned Pa 119'21 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Medical marihuana: facilities; financial statements required to be submitted by facilities; modify due date. Amends sec. 701 of 2016 PA 281 (MCL 333.27701).
Title
Medical marihuana: facilities; financial statements required to be submitted by facilities; modify due date. Amends sec. 701 of 2016 PA 281 (MCL 333.27701).
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Hauck [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-11-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 451 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-11-03 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 467 (Y: 105 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-03 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 467 (Y: 105 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-07 | House | Assigned Pa 119'21 With Immediate Effect |
2021-12-07 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/07/2021 02:44 Pm |
2021-12-07 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/07/2021 08:11 Am |
2021-12-02 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/02/2021 01:31 Pm |
2021-11-30 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2021-11-30 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2021-11-30 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2021-11-30 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2021-11-30 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 451 Yeas 36 Nays 1 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2021-11-10 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2021-11-10 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2021-10-14 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2021-10-13 | House | Transmitted |
2021-10-13 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 467 Yeas 105 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 |
2021-10-13 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-10-07 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-10-07 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2021-10-07 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-09-21 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-09-21 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-05-27 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/26/2021 |
2021-05-26 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2021-05-26 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-05-26 | House | Introduced By Representative Roger Hauck |