MI HB4921 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 426'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 426'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Use tax; collections; accelerated filers; revise effective date. Amends sec. 6 of 1937 PA 94 (MCL 205.96).
Title
Use tax; collections; accelerated filers; revise effective date. Amends sec. 6 of 1937 PA 94 (MCL 205.96).
Sponsors
Rep. John Walsh [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-12-18 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 710 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 821 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-12-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 398 (Y: 109 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-30 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 821 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-12-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 398 (Y: 109 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-30 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 426'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/30/2014 @ 3:36 Pm 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/28/2014 @ 11:18 Am 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-30 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/23/2014 @ 2:08 Pm |
2014-12-18 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2014-12-18 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2014-12-18 | House | Roll Call # 710 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2014-12-18 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2014-12-17 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2014-12-17 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 821 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2014-12-16 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2014-12-16 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2014-12-16 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2014-12-04 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2014-12-04 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-12-04 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2013-11-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance |
2013-11-12 | House | Transmitted |
2013-11-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 398 Yeas 109 Nays 1 |
2013-11-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2013-11-07 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2013-11-07 | House | Read A Second Time |
2013-10-30 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2013-10-30 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2013-08-16 | House | Printed Bill Filed 08/02/2013 |
2013-08-02 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2013-08-02 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-08-02 | House | Introduced By Representative John Walsh |