MI HB4891 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Human Services
Pending: Senate Families, Seniors And Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Civil rights; privacy; parental eavesdropping; allow under certain circumstances. Amends sec. 539g of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.539g).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil rights; privacy; parental eavesdropping; allow under certain circumstances. Amends sec. 539g of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.539g).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 227 (Y: 105 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-17SenateReferred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Human Services
2018-04-12HouseTransmitted
2018-04-12HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 227 Yeas 105 Nays 3
2018-04-12HouseRead A Third Time
2018-04-11HousePlaced On Third Reading
2018-04-11HouseSubstitute H-3 Adopted
2018-04-11HouseRead A Second Time
2018-02-22HouseReferred To Second Reading
2018-02-22HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3
2017-09-06HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 08/16/2017
2017-08-16HouseReferred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors
2017-08-16HouseRead A First Time
2017-08-16HouseIntroduced By Representative Peter Lucido

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback