MI HB4891 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-09-25 - Recommendation Concurred In
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-09-25 - Recommendation Concurred In
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Liquor; tax; earmark of net revenues for substance use disorder prevention and treatment programs; create. Amends sec. 221 of 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.1221).
Title
Liquor; tax; earmark of net revenues for substance use disorder prevention and treatment programs; create. Amends sec. 221 of 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.1221).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-09-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-25 | House | Recommendation Concurred In |
2013-09-25 | House | Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Appropriations |
2013-08-02 | House | Printed Bill Filed 07/19/2013 |
2013-07-18 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2013-07-18 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-07-18 | House | Introduced By Representative Matt Lori |
Subjects
Health, substance abuse treatment
Liquor, tax
State agencies (existing), community health
Taxation, liquor
Liquor, tax
State agencies (existing), community health
Taxation, liquor