MI HB4871 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-15 - Assigned Pa 262'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-15 - Assigned Pa 262'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Economic development; other; qualifying period for assessment; modify. Amends secs. 10, 10a, 10c, 10f, 10g & 10k of 1961 PA 120 (MCL 125.990 et seq.)
Title
Economic development; other; qualifying period for assessment; modify. Amends secs. 10, 10a, 10c, 10f, 10g & 10k of 1961 PA 120 (MCL 125.990 et seq.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 489 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 200 (Y: 107 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 200 (Y: 107 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-15 | House | Assigned Pa 262'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-08-15 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 6/28/2018 @ 2:56 Pm |
2018-08-15 | House | Approved By The Governor 6/27/2018 @ 10:46 Pm |
2018-08-15 | House | Presented To The Governor 6/25/2018 @ 3:28 Pm |
2018-06-12 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-06-12 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 489 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Economic Development And International Investment |
2018-03-22 | House | Transmitted |
2018-03-22 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 200 Yeas 107 Nays 2 |
2018-03-22 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-03-21 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2018-03-21 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-03-06 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2017-09-06 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 08/16/2017 |
2017-08-16 | House | Referred To Committee On Commerce And Trade |
2017-08-16 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-08-16 | House | Introduced By Representative Stephanie Chang |