MI HB4864 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-25 - Assigned Pa 127'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-25 - Assigned Pa 127'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Crimes; controlled substances; attempt to commit "smurfing" crime; provide for 5-year stop-sale alert after conviction. Amends sec. 4 of 2014 PA 276 (MCL 28.124). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4767'15
Title
Crimes; controlled substances; attempt to commit "smurfing" crime; provide for 5-year stop-sale alert after conviction. Amends sec. 4 of 2014 PA 276 (MCL 28.124). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4767'15
Sponsors
Rep. John Kivela [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-10 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 228 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 243 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-28 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 399 (Y: 103 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 243 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-28 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 399 (Y: 103 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-25 | House | Assigned Pa 127'16 With Immediate Effect |
2016-05-25 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 5/25/2016 @ 10:18 Am |
2016-05-25 | House | Approved By The Governor 5/25/2016 @ 9:36 Am |
2016-05-17 | House | Presented To The Governor 5/12/2016 @ 3:42 Pm |
2016-05-10 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2016-05-10 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2016-05-10 | House | Roll Call # 228 Yeas 107 Nays 1 |
2016-05-10 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2016-05-10 | House | Rule Suspended |
2016-05-10 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2016-05-10 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 243 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2015-10-29 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2015-10-28 | House | Transmitted |
2015-10-28 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 399 Yeas 103 Nays 2 |
2015-10-28 | House | Read A Third Time |
2015-10-27 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2015-10-27 | House | Read A Second Time |
2015-10-13 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2015-10-13 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2015-09-16 | House | Printed Bill Filed 09/11/2015 |
2015-09-10 | House | Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice |
2015-09-10 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-09-10 | House | Introduced By Representative John Kivela |