MI HB4860 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 10 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-12-18 - Referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Townships: charter; conflict of interest policy for township officials; require. Amends sec. 7 of 1947 PA 359 (MCL 42.7).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Townships: charter; conflict of interest policy for township officials; require. Amends sec. 7 of 1947 PA 359 (MCL 42.7).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-12-10 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 412 (Y: 56 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-12-10 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 411 (Y: 57 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-12-18SenateReferred To Committee On Government Operations
2024-12-10HouseTransmitted
2024-12-10HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 412 Yeas 56 Nays 52 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
2024-12-10HouseVote Reconsidered
2024-12-10HousePassed Roll Call # 411 Yeas 57 Nays 50 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
2024-12-10HouseRead A Third Time
2024-11-13HousePlaced On Third Reading
2024-11-13HouseSubstitute (h-1) Adopted
2024-11-13HouseRead A Second Time
2023-09-13HouseReferred To Second Reading
2023-09-13HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
2023-07-18HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 06/28/2023
2023-06-28HouseReferred To Committee On Local Government And Municipal Finance
2023-06-28HouseRead A First Time
2023-06-28HouseIntroduced By Representative Denise Mentzer

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback