MI HB4860 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-27 - Assigned Pa 382'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-27 - Assigned Pa 382'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Property tax; assessments; penalty for failure to notify assessing office of transfer of ownership of property; modify. Amends sec. 27b of 1893 PA 206 (MCL 211.27b).
Title
Property tax; assessments; penalty for failure to notify assessing office of transfer of ownership of property; modify. Amends sec. 27b of 1893 PA 206 (MCL 211.27b).
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Stamas [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-12-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 894 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-23 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 287 (Y: 106 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-23 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 287 (Y: 106 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-27 | House | Assigned Pa 382'12 With Immediate Effect |
2012-12-27 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/19/2012 @ 8:49 Am |
2012-12-27 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/18/2012 @ 1:52 Pm |
2012-12-27 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/17/2012 @ 3:32 Pm |
2012-12-12 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-12 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-12-12 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2012-12-12 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-12 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 894 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2012-05-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance |
2012-05-23 | House | Transmitted |
2012-05-23 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 287 Yeas 106 Nays 2 |
2012-05-23 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-05-22 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-05-22 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2012-05-22 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-05-09 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-05-09 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2011-08-24 | House | Printed Bill Filed 07/27/2011 |
2011-07-27 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2011-07-27 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-07-27 | House | Introduced By Representative Jim Stamas |