MI HB4858 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Engrossed on November 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-30 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety
Pending: Senate Judiciary And Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-30 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety
Pending: Senate Judiciary And Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Health occupations: health professionals; permanent revocation of license or registration if convicted of sexual conduct under pretext of medical treatment; provide for. Amends sec. 16226 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.16226). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4857'21
Title
Health occupations: health professionals; permanent revocation of license or registration if convicted of sexual conduct under pretext of medical treatment; provide for. Amends sec. 16226 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.16226). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4857'21
Sponsors
Rep. Daire Rendon [R] | Rep. Julie Brixie [D] | Rep. Helena Scott [D] | Rep. Julie Rogers [D] |
Rep. Sara Cambensy [D] | Rep. Rachel Hood [D] | Rep. Lori Stone [D] | Rep. Padma Kuppa [D] |
Rep. Brenda Carter [D] | Rep. Kyra Bolden [D] | Rep. Annette Glenn [R] | Rep. Terry Sabo [D] |
Rep. Karen Whitsett [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-11-10 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 547 (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety |
2021-11-10 | House | Transmitted |
2021-11-10 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 547 Yeas 105 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 |
2021-11-10 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-11-09 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-11-09 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-10-19 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-10-19 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-05-19 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/18/2021 |
2021-05-18 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2021-05-18 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-05-18 | House | Introduced By Representative Daire Rendon |
Subjects
Crimes: criminal sexual conduct
Health occupations: health professionals
Occupations: individual licensing and registration
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs
Health occupations: health professionals
Occupations: individual licensing and registration
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs