MI HB4856 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-7)
Status: Engrossed on November 4 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-11-09 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety
Pending: Senate Judiciary And Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Civil rights: public records; identity of parties proceeding anonymously in civil actions alleging sexual misconduct; exempt from disclosure under freedom of information act. Amends sec. 13 of 1976 PA 442 (MCL 15.243).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil rights: public records; identity of parties proceeding anonymously in civil actions alleging sexual misconduct; exempt from disclosure under freedom of information act. Amends sec. 13 of 1976 PA 442 (MCL 15.243).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-11-04 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 529 (Y: 96 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-09SenateReferred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety
2021-11-04HouseTransmitted
2021-11-04HouseTitle Amended
2021-11-04HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 529 Yeas 96 Nays 6 Excused 0 Not Voting 7
2021-11-04HouseRead A Third Time
2021-11-03HousePlaced On Third Reading
2021-11-03HouseSubstitute (h-1) Adopted
2021-11-03HouseRead A Second Time
2021-09-28HouseReferred To Second Reading
2021-09-28HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
2021-05-19HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 05/18/2021
2021-05-18HouseReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2021-05-18HouseRead A First Time
2021-05-18HouseIntroduced By Representative Kyra Bolden

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback