MI HB4853 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 18-1)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 513'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Criminal procedure; sentencing guidelines; sentencing guidelines for crime of selling or providing medical marihuana to unprescribed user; implement. Amends sec. 13n, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.13n).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal procedure; sentencing guidelines; sentencing guidelines for crime of selling or providing medical marihuana to unprescribed user; implement. Amends sec. 13n, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.13n).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-12-14 - House - House Third Reading: Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 894 (Y: 101 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 999 (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 244 (Y: 100 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-12-31HouseAssigned Pa 513'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda
2012-12-31HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 12/28/2012 @ 4:38 Pm 2012 Addenda
2012-12-31HouseApproved By The Governor 12/27/2012 @ 5:10 Pm 2012 Addenda
2012-12-31HousePresented To The Governor 12/27/2012 @ 11:12 Am 2012 Addenda
2012-12-14HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2012-12-14HouseFull Title Agreed To
2012-12-14HouseSenate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 894 Yeas 101 Nays 5
2012-12-13HouseLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2012-12-13HouseReturned From Senate With Amendment(s) With Immediate Effect And Full Title
2012-12-13SenateInserted Full Title
2012-12-13SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 999 Yeas 36 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2012-12-05SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2012-12-05SenateRules Suspended
2012-12-05SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Amendment(s)
2012-12-05SenateAmendment(s) Concurred In
2012-12-05SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Amendment(s)
2012-09-11SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2012-09-11SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2012-09-11SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2012-05-08SenateReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2012-05-03HouseTransmitted
2012-05-03HouseTitle Amended
2012-05-03HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 244 Yeas 100 Nays 9
2012-05-03HouseRead A Third Time
2012-05-02HousePlaced On Third Reading
2012-05-02HouseSubstitute H-1 Adopted
2012-05-02HouseRead A Second Time
2012-03-29HouseReferred To Second Reading
2012-03-29HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1
2011-07-27HousePrinted Bill Filed 07/01/2011
2011-06-30HouseReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2011-06-30HouseRead A First Time
2011-06-30HouseIntroduced By Representative Ed Mcbroom

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2011-HB-4853
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billintroduced/House/htm/2011-HIB-4853.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billengrossed/House/htm/2011-HEBH-4853.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billengrossed/House/htm/2011-HEBS-4853.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billenrolled/House/htm/2011-HNB-4853.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/publicact/htm/2012-PA-0513.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/House/htm/2012-HJ-03-29-034.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/House/htm/2012-HJ-05-03-043.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/Senate/htm/2012-SJ-09-11-063.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/Senate/htm/2012-SJ-12-13-080.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/House/htm/2012-HJ-12-14-083.htm

Bill Comments

feedback