MI HB4821 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2)
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Assigned Pa 39'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2)
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Assigned Pa 39'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
History and arts: historic sites; Michigan law enforcement officers memorial monument fund commission; extend commission. Amends sec. 5 of 2004 PA 177 (MCL 28.785) & repeals sec. 7 of 2004 PA 177 (MCL 28.787).
Title
History and arts: historic sites; Michigan law enforcement officers memorial monument fund commission; extend commission. Amends sec. 5 of 2004 PA 177 (MCL 28.785) & repeals sec. 7 of 2004 PA 177 (MCL 28.787).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 63 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-29 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 444 (Y: 102 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-29 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 444 (Y: 102 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | House | Assigned Pa 39'22 With Immediate Effect |
2022-03-23 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 03/23/2022 10:46 Am |
2022-03-23 | House | Approved By The Governor 03/23/2022 09:43 Am |
2022-03-09 | House | Presented To The Governor 03/09/2022 02:52 Pm |
2022-03-08 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2022-03-08 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2022-03-08 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 63 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2021-09-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety |
2021-09-29 | House | Transmitted |
2021-09-29 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 444 Yeas 102 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 6 |
2021-09-29 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-09-28 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-09-28 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2021-09-28 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-06-15 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-06-15 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2021-05-12 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/11/2021 |
2021-05-11 | House | Referred To Committee On Military, Veterans And Homeland Security |
2021-05-11 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-05-11 | House | Introduced By Representative Timothy Beson |