MI HB4812 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on July 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-01 - Assigned Pa 156'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on July 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-01 - Assigned Pa 156'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Property tax: assessments; true cash value of certain nonprofit housing property; clarify method to determine. Amends sec. 27 of 1893 PA 206 (MCL 211.27).
Title
Property tax: assessments; true cash value of certain nonprofit housing property; clarify method to determine. Amends sec. 27 of 1893 PA 206 (MCL 211.27).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 369 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-16 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 347 (Y: 103 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-16 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 347 (Y: 103 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-01 | House | Assigned Pa 156'22 With Immediate Effect |
2022-07-01 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 07/19/2022 12:12 Pm |
2022-07-01 | House | Approved By The Governor 07/19/2022 09:50 Am |
2022-07-01 | House | Presented To The Governor 07/11/2022 12:48 Pm |
2022-06-30 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2022-06-30 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2022-06-30 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 369 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance |
2021-06-17 | House | Transmitted |
2021-06-17 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 347 Yeas 103 Nays 7 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2021-06-17 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-06-16 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-06-16 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2021-06-16 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-05-26 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-05-26 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2021-05-11 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/06/2021 |
2021-05-06 | House | Referred To Committee On Financial Services |
2021-05-06 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-05-06 | House | Introduced By Representative Julie Alexander |