MI HB4749 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-05 - Referred To Committee On Elections And Government Reform
Pending: Senate Elections And Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-05 - Referred To Committee On Elections And Government Reform
Pending: Senate Elections And Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; candidates; candidate filing fee in lieu of nominating petitions for the office of county road commissioner; increase, and make nonrefundable. Amends sec. 254 of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.254). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4745'17, HB 4746'17, HB 4747'17, HB 4748'17, HB 4750'17
Title
Elections; candidates; candidate filing fee in lieu of nominating petitions for the office of county road commissioner; increase, and make nonrefundable. Amends sec. 254 of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.254). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4745'17, HB 4746'17, HB 4747'17, HB 4748'17, HB 4750'17
Sponsors
Rep. Tommy Brann [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-30 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 445 (Y: 91 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Elections And Government Reform |
2018-05-30 | House | Transmitted |
2018-05-30 | House | Title Amended |
2018-05-30 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 445 Yeas 91 Nays 16 |
2018-05-30 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-05-29 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-05-29 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2018-05-29 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-05-17 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-05-17 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2017-06-14 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/13/2017 |
2017-06-13 | House | Referred To Committee On Elections And Ethics |
2017-06-13 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-06-13 | House | Introduced By Representative Tommy Brann |