MI HB4745 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-21 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-21 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Environmental protection; groundwater contamination; annual appropriation for certain geological survey work; direct legislature to make. Amends sec. 60108 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.60108).
Title
Environmental protection; groundwater contamination; annual appropriation for certain geological survey work; direct legislature to make. Amends sec. 60108 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.60108).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1) |
2019-06-26 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/26/2019 |
2019-06-20 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources And Outdoor Recreation |
2019-06-20 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-06-20 | House | Introduced By Representative Bronna Kahle |
Subjects
Appropriations: other
Environmental protection: groundwater contamination
Higher education: other
Natural resources: other
Environmental protection: groundwater contamination
Higher education: other
Natural resources: other
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2019-HB-4745 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/House/htm/2019-HIB-4745.htm |