MI HB4704 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-21 - Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Veterans
Pending: Senate Families, Seniors And Veterans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-21 - Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Veterans
Pending: Senate Families, Seniors And Veterans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Children: protection; child protection law; modify to require the department to document why an investigation was abbreviated and to allow for an abbreviated checklist. Amends secs. 2 & 8e of 1975 PA 238 (MCL 722.622 & 722.628e).
Title
Children: protection; child protection law; modify to require the department to document why an investigation was abbreviated and to allow for an abbreviated checklist. Amends secs. 2 & 8e of 1975 PA 238 (MCL 722.622 & 722.628e).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-16 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 15 (Y: 104 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Veterans |
2020-01-16 | House | Transmitted |
2020-01-16 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 15 Yeas 104 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 |
2020-01-16 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-01-14 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-01-14 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-12-10 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-12-10 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2019-09-18 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2019-06-12 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/12/2019 |
2019-06-11 | House | Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors |
2019-09-17 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-06-11 | House | Introduced By Representative Kathy Crawford |