MI HB4704 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-03 - Assigned Pa 172'13 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-03 - Assigned Pa 172'13 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Counties; financing; challenging an approved budget; clarify. Amends secs. 16 & 18 of 1968 PA 2 (MCL 141.436 & 141.438).
Title
Counties; financing; challenging an approved budget; clarify. Amends secs. 16 & 18 of 1968 PA 2 (MCL 141.436 & 141.438).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-11-06 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 374 (Y: 87 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-06 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 374 (Y: 87 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-31 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 479 (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-10-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 195 (Y: 88 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-06 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 374 (Y: 87 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-31 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 479 (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-10-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 195 (Y: 88 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-03 | House | Assigned Pa 172'13 With Immediate Effect |
2013-12-03 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 11/18/2013 @ 1:19 Pm |
2013-12-03 | House | Approved By The Governor 11/18/2013 @ 9:48 Am |
2013-11-13 | House | Presented To The Governor 11/13/2013 @ 10:17 Am |
2013-11-06 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2013-11-06 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2013-11-06 | House | Roll Call # 374 Yeas 87 Nays 22 |
2013-11-06 | House | Senate Substitute S-3 Concurred In |
2013-10-31 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2013-10-31 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-3 With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2013-10-31 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2013-10-31 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 479 Yeas 29 Nays 8 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2013-10-30 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-3 |
2013-10-30 | Senate | Substitute S-3 Concurred In |
2013-10-30 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-3 |
2013-10-22 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-3 |
2013-10-22 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2013-10-22 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2013-06-05 | House | Transmitted |
2013-06-05 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 195 Yeas 88 Nays 21 |
2013-06-05 | House | Read A Third Time |
2013-06-04 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2013-06-04 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2013-06-04 | House | Read A Second Time |
2013-05-23 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2013-05-23 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2013-05-08 | House | Printed Bill Filed 05/08/2013 |
2013-05-07 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2013-05-07 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-05-07 | House | Introduced By Representative Peter Pettalia |
Subjects
Counties, boards and commissions
Counties, employees and officers
Counties, financing
Courts, court of appeals
Courts, funding
Counties, employees and officers
Counties, financing
Courts, court of appeals
Courts, funding