MI HB4700 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 611'18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 611'18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; precinct delegates; provision related to allowing precinct delegates to file as a write-in on election day; eliminate, and modify certain references to board of primary election inspectors. Amends secs. 605, 607, 608, 625 & 737a of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.605 et seq.).
Title
Elections; precinct delegates; provision related to allowing precinct delegates to file as a write-in on election day; eliminate, and modify certain references to board of primary election inspectors. Amends secs. 605, 607, 608, 625 & 737a of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.605 et seq.).
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Lilly [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 1001 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 627 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 627 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 611'18 |
2018-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/28/2018 @ 5:34 Pm |
2018-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/28/2018 @ 4:05 Pm 12/31/18 Addenda |
2018-12-28 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/26/2018 @ 7:34 Pm |
2018-12-20 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-20 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-12-20 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Full Title |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 1001 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Elections And Government Reform |
2018-11-08 | House | Transmitted |
2018-11-08 | House | Title Amended |
2018-11-08 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 627 Yeas 108 Nays 0 |
2018-11-08 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-11-08 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-11-08 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-11-08 | House | Substitute H-3 Adopted |
2018-11-08 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-05-17 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-05-17 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 |
2017-06-07 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/06/2017 |
2017-06-06 | House | Referred To Committee On Elections And Ethics |
2017-06-06 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-06-06 | House | Introduced By Representative Jim Lilly |