MI HB4691 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 31 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-06-20 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Family law; child custody; joint custody in every custody dispute between parents; mandate except in certain circumstances. Amends secs. 1, 2, 3, 4, 6a, 7, 7a & 11 of 1970 PA 91 (MCL 722.21 et seq.).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Family law; child custody; joint custody in every custody dispute between parents; mandate except in certain circumstances. Amends secs. 1, 2, 3, 4, 6a, 7, 7a & 11 of 1970 PA 91 (MCL 722.21 et seq.).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-20 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-20HouseReferred To Second Reading
2017-06-20HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2
2017-06-06HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 05/31/2017
2017-05-31HouseReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2017-05-31HouseRead A First Time
2017-05-31HouseIntroduced By Representative Jim Runestad

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback