MI HB4688 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Introduced on May 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-11-02 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-11-02 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Labor: collective bargaining; minimum staffing levels within a bargaining unit; make a mandatory subject of bargaining. Amends secs. 11 & 15 of 1947 PA 336 (MCL 423.211 & 423.215).
Title
Labor: collective bargaining; minimum staffing levels within a bargaining unit; make a mandatory subject of bargaining. Amends secs. 11 & 15 of 1947 PA 336 (MCL 423.211 & 423.215).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-11-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-02 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2023-11-02 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2) |
2023-06-06 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/30/2023 |
2023-05-30 | House | Referred To Committee On Labor |
2023-05-30 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-05-30 | House | Introduced By Representative Jim Haadsma |
Subjects
Labor: collective bargaining
Labor: fair employment practices
Labor: public service employment
Labor: working conditions
Labor: fair employment practices
Labor: public service employment
Labor: working conditions