MI HB4667 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-10-26 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Health: immunizations; COVID-19 vaccination passport; prohibit governmental entity from producing, issuing, or providing an incentive for under certain circumstances. Creates new act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health: immunizations; COVID-19 vaccination passport; prohibit governmental entity from producing, issuing, or providing an incentive for under certain circumstances. Creates new act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-10-26 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 276 (Y: 62 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-26SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2021-10-26SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2021-06-03SenateReferred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services
2021-06-02HouseTransmitted
2021-06-02HouseTitle Amended
2021-06-02HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 276 Yeas 62 Nays 47 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
2021-06-02HouseRead A Third Time
2021-05-19HousePlaced On Third Reading
2021-05-19HouseSubstitute (h-4) Adopted
2021-05-19HouseRead A Second Time
2021-05-13HouseReferred To Second Reading
2021-05-13HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-4)
2021-04-21HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 04/20/2021
2021-04-20HouseReferred To Committee On Oversight
2021-04-20HouseRead A First Time
2021-04-20HouseIntroduced By Representative Sue Allor

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2021-HB-4667
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billintroduced/House/htm/2021-HIB-4667.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billengrossed/House/htm/2021-HEBH-4667.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2021-HCVBS-4667-0N295.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4667-7250EA17.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4667-54289026.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4667-B2553958.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4667-A4F81AE0.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-4667-L.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-4667-F.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-05-13-043.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-06-02-051.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/Senate/htm/2021-SJ-10-26-085.htm

Bill Comments

feedback