MI HB4654 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-10 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services
Pending: Senate Health Policy And Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-10 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services
Pending: Senate Health Policy And Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Health: diseases; rare disease advisory council; create. Amends 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.1101 - 333.25211) by adding secs. 5135 & 5135a.
Title
Health: diseases; rare disease advisory council; create. Amends 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.1101 - 333.25211) by adding secs. 5135 & 5135a.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-11-09 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 540 (Y: 92 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-14 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-14 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services |
2021-11-09 | House | Transmitted |
2021-11-09 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 540 Yeas 92 Nays 12 Excused 0 Not Voting 5 |
2021-11-09 | House | Postponed Temporarily |
2021-11-09 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-11-04 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-11-04 | House | Substitute (h-3) Adopted |
2021-11-04 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-10-14 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-10-14 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-3) |
2021-04-20 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/15/2021 |
2021-04-15 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2021-04-15 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-04-15 | House | Introduced By Representative Cara Clemente |
Subjects
Health: diseases
State agencies (existing): boards and commissions
State agencies (existing): health and human services
State agencies (existing): boards and commissions
State agencies (existing): health and human services